EP1266251 - ION EXCHANGE WAVEGUIDES AND METHODS OF FABRICATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 22.10.2010 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.10.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 24.11.2010 [2010/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CALIFORNIA INSTITUTE OF TECHNOLOGY 1200 East California Boulevard Mail Code 210-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | For all designated states California Institute of Technology 1200 East California Boulevard, Mail Code 210-85 Pasadena, CA 91125 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BURROWS, Lee, J. 4106 - 25th Street, 4 San Francisco, CA 94114 / US | [2002/51] | Representative(s) | Falk, Urs Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2002/51] | Falk, Urs, Dr. Patentanwaltsbüro Dr. Urs Falk, Eichholzweg 9A 6312 Steinhausen / CH | Application number, filing date | 99974127.5 | 10.11.1999 | [2002/51] | WO1999US26662 | Priority number, date | US19990419347 | 15.10.1999 Original published format: US 419347 | [2002/51] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO0129593 | Date: | 26.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/17] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1266251 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.04.2001 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2002/51] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/12, G02F1/035 | [2002/51] | CPC: |
G02F1/035 (EP,US);
C30B15/00 (EP,US);
C30B29/30 (EP,US);
C30B33/00 (EP,US);
G02B6/1345 (EP,US);
G02B2006/12169 (EP,US);
G02F2201/066 (EP,US);
G02F2201/07 (EP,US);
G02F2202/20 (EP,US);
Y10S117/91 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [2004/20] |
Former [2002/51] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | LT | Not yet paid | LV | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RO | Not yet paid | SI | Not yet paid | Title | German: | IONENAUSTAUSCH-WELLENLEITER UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG | [2002/51] | English: | ION EXCHANGE WAVEGUIDES AND METHODS OF FABRICATION | [2002/51] | French: | GUIDES D'ONDES OBTENUS PAR ECHANGE IONIQUE ET LEURS PROCEDES DE FABRICATION | [2002/51] | Entry into regional phase | 15.05.2002 | National basic fee paid | 15.05.2002 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.05.2002 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.05.2001 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: EP | 15.05.2002 | Examination requested [2002/51] | 08.09.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 01.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.07.2006 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.11.2006 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 14.02.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.06.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.04.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/47] | 05.07.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2010/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.05.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.12.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.11.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 22.11.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 29.11.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 15.11.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 31.03.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2009 | 11   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US4196963 (CHEN BOR-UEI [US], et al) [X] 14,36,59 * column 3, line 10 - line 64 * * column 4, line 47 - column 6, line 4 * * column 7, line 1 - line 36; figure 2; claims 1,3,5,7 *; | [Y]US4640736 (HOLMAN ROBERT L [US]) [Y] 1,2,4-7,11,15-17,21,23,24,26-29,33,37-39,43,45-47,49-52,56,58,65-72 * column 2, line 9 - line 51 * * column 4, line 33 - line 41 * * column 5, line 53 - column 7, line 2; figure 5 *; | [X]US5095518 (YOUNG WHU-MING [US], et al) [X] 14,59,60 * column 1, line 15 - line 62 * * column 4, line 56 - column 7, line 47; figures 4,5 *; | [XY]US5193136 (CHANG CHIN L [US], et al) [X] 62-64 * column 1, line 40 - column 3, line 34 * * column 3, line 59 - column 4, line 17; figures 1,2; claims 6,10,11 * [Y] 1,2,4-7,11,15-17,21,23,24,26-29,33,37-39,43,45-47,49-52,56,58,65-72; | [XY]EP0635735 (LITTON SYSTEMS INC [US]) [X] 14,59 * in connection with US-A-5 193 136 *; column 2, line 1 - line 41 * [Y] 1,2,4-7,11,15-17,21,23,24,26-29,33,37-39,43,45-47,49-52,56,58,65-72; | [ED]WO9963393 (CALIFORNIA INST OF TECHN [US]) [ED] 1,5-23,27-46,50-72* the whole document * |