Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | BE | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | CH | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | CY | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | ES | Extinction: 26.11.2007 | FI | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | FR | Extinction: 31.10.2007 | GB | | GR | Extinction: 16.11.2007 | IE | Extinction: 12.10.2007 | IT | Extinction: 31.10.2007 | LI | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | LU | Extinction: 12.10.2007 | MC | Extinction: 31.10.2007 | NL | Extinction: 15.08.2007 | PT | Extinction: 15.01.2008 | SE | Extinction: 15.11.2007 | Procédure d'examen | 03.07.2007 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 19.04.2002 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 19.04.2002 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 19.04.2002 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 19.04.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 31.10.2003 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 20.10.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 21.10.2005 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 26.10.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 15.08.2007 | Procédure dopposition | 16.05.2008 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 23.07.2008 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020419 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 15.08.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 15.08.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de lévénement: | 27.09.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60036010 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20070927 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20071126 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.02.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20071116 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071031 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20080115 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20071115 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.07.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20080516 | | Date de lévénement: | 06.08.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071012 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071031 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070815 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071012 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071031 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE | Effective DATE: | 20111207 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | QUALCOMM INCORPORATED (N.D. GES. D. STAATES DE, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: ATHEROS TECHNOLOGY LTD., SANTA CLARA, US | Effective DATE: | 20111207 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.11.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 04.12.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | Free Format Text: | REGISTERED BETWEEN 20131107 AND 20131113 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.01.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER, DE | Effective DATE: | 20131112 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.01.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | QUALCOMM INCORPORATED (N.D. GES. D. STAATES DE, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: QUALCOMM ATHEROS TECHNOLOGY LTD., PEMBROKE, BM | Effective DATE: | 20131112 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | QUALCOMM INCORPORATED (N.D. GES. D. STAATES DE, US | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: ATHEROS TECHNOLOGY LTD., SANTA CLARA, CALIF., US | Effective DATE: | 20111207 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE | Effective DATE: | 20111207 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.01.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | VOSSIUS & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE RECHTSANWAELT, DE | Effective DATE: | 20131112 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20190925 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20190917 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60036010 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Date de lévénement: | 04.11.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20201011 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20201011 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.07.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.03.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.06.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 20.06.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |