Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | Extinction: 18.01.2021 | NL | | Procédure d'examen | 01.08.2012 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 19.08.2002 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 19.08.2002 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 19.08.2002 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 31.01.2003 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 02.02.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 31.01.2005 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 31.01.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 31.01.2007 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 25.01.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 30.01.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 25.01.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | 25.01.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 11 | 25.01.2012 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 12 | Brevet européen délivré | 19.09.2012 | Procédure dopposition | 06.05.2022 | Effet juridique de la révocation du brevet | publié le 07.09.2022 | Recours après opposition | 24.09.2015 | APPEAL FILED | 25.11.2015 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 07.05.2021 | APPEAL RESULT | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE TR | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20020819 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 26.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 02.02.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20041221 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS INC. | | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 15.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20121115 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MOMENTIVE PERFORMANCE MATERIALS INC. | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.01.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.10.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW CORNING CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.02.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | DOW SILICONES CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20130619 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20200126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200129 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 27.11.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 19.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Date de lévénement: | 20.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20210118 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.02.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20210118 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | OBSERVATIONS FILED BY THIRD PARTIES | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNTIPA | | Date de lévénement: | 13.09.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20210118 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.05.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Date de lévénement: | 17.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 28.06.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.01.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Date de lévénement: | 03.12.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 12.08.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.08.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Date de lévénement: | 06.05.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Date de lévénement: | 06.05.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 60147131 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Date de lévénement: | 14.09.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20220506 | |