Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | IT | | Procédure d'examen | 04.08.2004 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Brevet européen délivré | 06.10.2004 | Procédure dopposition | 07.07.2005 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 21.09.2005 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 20.08.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 20.08.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK RO | | Date de lévénement: | 05.11.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20030902 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | DE FR IT | | Date de lévénement: | 06.10.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR IT | | Date de lévénement: | 11.11.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 50201210 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20041111 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 03.11.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | GERMAN | | Date de lévénement: | 18.05.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20050707 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.08.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 05.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20070831 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.12.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20051216 | Year of Fee Payment: | 04 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20061231 | Year of Fee Payment: | 05 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20070102 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071217 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20121231 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.07.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 50201210 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 16.10.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 50201210 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20140701 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140701 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.08.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.08.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.04.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.08.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 12.08.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |