Etats contractants désignés | ES | | IT | | Procédure d'examen | 05.04.2012 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 28.05.2004 | Traduction produite | | 28.05.2004 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 28.05.2004 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 28.05.2004 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 28.05.2004 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 27.12.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 20.12.2005 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 21.12.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 19.12.2007 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 29.12.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 23.12.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 22.12.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 09.12.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | Brevet européen délivré | 20.06.2012 | Procédure dopposition | 21.03.2013 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 29.05.2013 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 01.09.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040528 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.09.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 01.09.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL LT LV MK RO | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 51/487 A | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 57/05 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 57/07 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 51/25 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 67/60 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7C 07C 69/54 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 01J 19/00 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 01D 3/00 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 01D 3/14 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 01D 3/24 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | 7B 01D 3/32 B | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20041126 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.11.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION | | Date de lévénement: | 04.01.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE 8566 | Code Expl.: | -DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20100527 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01D 3/14 20060101AFI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01D 3/24 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01D 3/32 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01J 8/22 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01J 14/00 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01J 19/00 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01J 19/18 20060101ALI20111122BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 28.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING (METH)ACRYLIC ACID COMPOUNDS | | Date de lévénement: | 20.06.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | ES IT | | Date de lévénement: | 04.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION | | Date de lévénement: | 26.09.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2387564 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20120926 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20130321 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.11.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: C07C0051487000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B01D0003140000 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES PC2A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSFER OF PATENT | OWNER: | MITSUBISHI CHEMICAL CORPORATION | Effective DATE: | 20180130 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.04.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.07.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 26.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20211110 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20220104 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.04.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20230428 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20221205 | |