Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HU | | IE | | IT | | LI | | LU | | MC | | NL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | TR | | Procédure d'examen | 17.03.2009 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 13.10.2004 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 13.10.2004 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 13.10.2004 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 13.10.2004 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 15.02.2005 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 06.03.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 05.03.2007 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 10.03.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 06.03.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 27.05.2009 | Procédure dopposition | 02.03.2010 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 28.04.2010 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20041013 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 22.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/16 20060101AFI20060127BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 22.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/28 20060101ALI20060127BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 22.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/50 20060101ALI20060127BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 22.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 31/485 20060101ALI20060127BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 22.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20060202 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/14 20060101AFI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/16 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/22 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/24 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/26 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/48 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/52 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | A61K 9/54 20060101ALI20071029BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 30.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT PUBLISHED (CORRECTED) | Effective DATE: | 20071221 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080305 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.06.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 27.05.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 27.05.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT (SCHWEIZ) MBH | | Date de lévénement: | 09.07.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 60327807 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20090709 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 10.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Date de lévénement: | 23.10.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2327034 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A. | Free Format Text: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.#2, AVENUE CHARLES DE GAULLE#1653 LUXEMBOURG (LU) -TRANSFER TO- EURO-CELTIQUE S.A.#2, AVENUE CHARLES DE GAULLE#1653 LUXEMBOURG (LU) | | Date de lévénement: | 28.01.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HU AG4A E006288 HU | Code Expl.: | +FILING OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE TEXT OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Date de lévénement: | 22.09.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Date de lévénement: | 05.05.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20100302 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20090820 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG RO EPE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA | | Date de lévénement: | 15.10.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE FG4A E003398 EE | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF THE SPECIFICATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT VALID IN ESTONIA | Effective DATE: | 20090826 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.02.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.09.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GR EP 20090401995 GR | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTSGESELLSCHAFT MBH, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LUXEMBURG, LU | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R081 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LUXEMBURG, LU | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: EURO-CELTIQUE S.A., LU | | Date de lévénement: | 22.02.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELL, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R082 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE | REPRESENTATIVE: | MAIWALD PATENTANWALTS- UND RECHTSANWALTSGESELL, DE | | Date de lévénement: | 29.03.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20190222 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Payment DATE: | 20190222 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20190221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Payment DATE: | 20190220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Payment DATE: | 20190221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20190227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Payment DATE: | 20190220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Payment DATE: | 20190322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20190221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Payment DATE: | 20190221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Payment DATE: | 20190228 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20190222 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.06.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Payment DATE: | 20190220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20190301 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.08.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20190401 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG EE MM4A E003398 EE | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BY NOT PAYING THE ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200928 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.11.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.11.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 432065 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.12.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SK MM4A E 5932 SK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF MAINTENANCE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SI KO00 | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE OF PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20201113 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.12.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200327 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200327 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20201008 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20201130 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.02.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.02.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200327 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.02.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200331 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI MAE | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT EXPIRED | | Date de lévénement: | 24.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.03.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.12.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.11.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | AVAILABILITY OF INFORMATION RELATED TO THE PUBLICATION OF THE INTERNATIONAL SEARCH REPORT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009015 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.08.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20220218 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20220217 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20220225 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20220218 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20220217 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20220217 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200326 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20220401 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.03.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 60327807 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 29.03.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MK | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED BECAUSE OF REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20230325 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.04.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20230325 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.04.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20230426 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230325 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20230327 | |