Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 04.05.2017 | BE | Extinction: 31.05.2017 | BG | Extinction: 14.03.2017 | CH | Extinction: 31.05.2017 | CY | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | CZ | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | EE | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | ES | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | FI | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | FR | | GB | | GR | Extinction: 15.03.2017 | HU | Extinction: 04.05.2004 | IE | Extinction: 04.05.2017 | IT | | LI | Extinction: 31.05.2017 | LU | Extinction: 04.05.2017 | MC | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | NL | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | PL | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | PT | Extinction: 14.04.2017 | RO | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | SE | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | SI | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | SK | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | TR | Extinction: 14.12.2016 | Procédure d'examen | 24.10.2016 | Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s) | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 12.01.2006 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 12.01.2006 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 12.01.2006 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 16.05.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 12.05.2007 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 08.03.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 15.05.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 31.03.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 12.05.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 24.05.2012 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 13.05.2013 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | 08.05.2014 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 11 | 12.05.2015 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 12 | 31.05.2016 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 13 | Brevet européen délivré | 14.12.2016 | Procédure dopposition | 15.09.2017 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 22.11.2017 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 07.06.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20060112 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.06.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 11.10.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 25.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20111228 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.08.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20160718 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.12.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | FRONIUS INTERNATIONAL GMBH | | Date de lévénement: | 14.12.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 14.12.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Date de lévénement: | 15.12.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 853133 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20170115 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.01.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 502004015416 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Date de lévénement: | 19.04.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.04.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20170315 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.04.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20170414 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20170314 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170531 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.11.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20170915 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 502004015416 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.12.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170531 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170531 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.03.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170504 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170504 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.07.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 853133 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170504 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170531 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170504 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.04.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170531 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.06.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT; INVALID AB INITIO | Effective DATE: | 20040504 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20161214 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20200528 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20200528 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20200522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20200728 | Year of Fee Payment: | 17 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.11.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.10.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.05.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.10.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 11.11.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 502004015416 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20210504 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.10.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20211201 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210504 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20210531 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200504 | |