Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FI | Extinction: 20.04.2016 | FR | | GB | | NL | Extinction: 20.04.2016 | Procédure d'examen | 29.02.2016 | Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s) | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 24.08.2006 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 24.08.2006 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 24.08.2006 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 24.08.2006 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 27.02.2007 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 28.02.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 26.02.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 16.02.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 15.02.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 15.02.2012 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 12.02.2013 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 12.02.2014 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | 11.02.2015 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 11 | 10.02.2016 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 12 | Brevet européen délivré | 20.04.2016 | Procédure dopposition | 23.01.2017 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 29.03.2017 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 25.10.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20060824 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.10.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FI FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 29.11.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | DEFERRED SEARCH REPORT PUBLISHED (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 16.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | DE FI FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 16.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 16/04 20060101AFI20070425BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 16/22 20060101ALI20070425BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G06K 19/07 20060101ALI20070425BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 03.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 16/04 20060101AFI20070425BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 03.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 16/22 20060101ALI20070827BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 03.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G06K 19/07 20060101ALI20070827BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 03.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 17/14 20060101ALI20070827BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 03.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20070831 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.10.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20080502 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20151222 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 29/00 20060101AFI20151211BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 20.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C 16/22 20060101ALI20151211BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 20.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KATO, KIYOSHI | | Date de lévénement: | 20.04.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FI FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 11.12.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602005049057 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: G11C0016220000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G11C0029000000 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.04.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 25.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602005049057 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Date de lévénement: | 28.09.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20160420 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20160420 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20160420 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.03.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20170123 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.01.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602005049057 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Date de lévénement: | 28.04.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20170131 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.10.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170204 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20171031 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170228 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170204 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.09.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602005049057 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20180901 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.03.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.03.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.12.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.09.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.02.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 24.02.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |