Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | BE | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | BG | Extinction: 13.10.2011 | CH | | CY | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | CZ | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | EE | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | ES | Extinction: 24.10.2011 | FI | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | FR | | GB | | GR | Extinction: 14.10.2011 | HU | Extinction: 04.04.2006 | IE | Extinction: 04.04.2012 | IS | Extinction: 13.11.2011 | IT | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | LI | | LT | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | LU | Extinction: 04.04.2012 | LV | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | MC | | NL | | PL | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | PT | Extinction: 14.11.2011 | RO | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | SE | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | SI | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | SK | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | TR | Extinction: 13.07.2011 | Procédure d'examen | 20.05.2011 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 11.09.2007 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 11.09.2007 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 11.09.2007 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 11.09.2007 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 10.04.2008 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 16.04.2009 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 15.04.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 12.04.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | Brevet européen délivré | 13.07.2011 | Procédure dopposition | 16.04.2012 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 20.06.2012 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 19.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20070911 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 19.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK YU | | Date de lévénement: | 09.07.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 01.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | E01D 1/00 20060101AFI20061024BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 01.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | B65G 69/28 20060101ALI20090224BHEP | | Date de lévénement: | 01.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090303 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20090526 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 15.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 03.08.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | DIVISIONAL APPLICATION: REFERENCE TO EARLIER APPLICATION (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 17.08.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de lévénement: | 08.09.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602006023069 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20110908 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20111114 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20111113 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20111014 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.10.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL T3 | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION FILED FOR AN EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED FOR NL, CONFIRMING ART. 52 PAR. 1 OR 6 OF THE PATENTS ACT 1995 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.06.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120416 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.06.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120430 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120430 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120430 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120404 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20111024 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.06.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20111013 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 516408 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20110713 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120404 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20060404 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 602006023069 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | Effective DATE: | 20120416 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.03.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20160330 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20160309 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20160411 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20170329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 06.12.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170501 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.12.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20170404 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20171229 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170501 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170502 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20170404 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.11.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 602006023069 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20181101 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.06.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.05.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.12.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.11.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 18.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |