Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | Extinction: 31.07.2012 | BG | Extinction: 04.10.2012 | CH | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | CY | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | CZ | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | EE | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | ES | Extinction: 17.07.2015 | FI | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | FR | | GB | | GR | Extinction: 05.10.2012 | HU | Extinction: 16.07.2007 | IE | Extinction: 16.07.2012 | IS | Extinction: 04.11.2012 | IT | Extinction: 16.07.2015 | LI | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | LT | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | LU | Extinction: 16.07.2012 | LV | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | MC | Extinction: 31.07.2012 | MT | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | NL | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | PL | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | PT | Extinction: 05.11.2012 | RO | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | SE | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | SI | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | SK | Extinction: 04.07.2012 | TR | | Procédure d'examen | 19.05.2012 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 22.01.2010 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 22.01.2010 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 22.01.2010 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 14.04.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 28.07.2010 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 19.07.2011 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | Surtaxe | Surtaxe concernant la taxe annuelle | 16.02.2010 | 03   M06  
Taxe payée le  
14.04.2010 | Brevet européen délivré | 04.07.2012 | Procédure dopposition | 11.09.2015 | Effet juridique de la révocation du brevet | publié le 11.11.2015 | Recours après opposition | 16.07.2015 | APPEAL FILED | 11.09.2015 | APPEAL RESULT | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 07.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20100122 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 07.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | AL BA HR MK RS | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | KOENIG, ARNO | | Date de lévénement: | 17.09.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK DE 1139299 HK | Code Expl.: | REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG | | Date de lévénement: | 20.10.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 22.12.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20101117 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | | Date de lévénement: | 04.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | RENTSCH PARTNER AG | | Date de lévénement: | 30.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 502007010162 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | Effective DATE: | 20120830 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Date de lévénement: | 22.10.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2389010 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20121022 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL VDEP | Code Expl.: | -DISCONTINUED IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG HK GR 1139299 HK | Code Expl.: | +STANDARD PATENTS GRANTED IN HONG KONG | | Date de lévénement: | 27.12.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121104 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121005 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120731 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121105 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.03.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | DENTALPOINT A.G. | Effective DATE: | 20120731 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | NOBEL BIOCARE AB | Effective DATE: | 20130404 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE MM4A | Code Expl.: | -PATENT LAPSED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120731 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R026 502007010162 DE | Code Expl.: | -OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20130404 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120716 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20121004 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.07.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 564818 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20120715 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.05.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120716 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20070716 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20140721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20140721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Payment DATE: | 20140701 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20140728 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20140721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20140721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20140611 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20140728 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PLX | Code Expl.: | -PATENT DECLARED INVALID FROM DATE OF GRANT ONWARDS | | Date de lévénement: | 11.11.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20150911 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R064 502007010162 DE | Code Expl.: | -EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL | | Date de lévénement: | 11.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R103 502007010162 DE | Code Expl.: | -PATENT REVOKED BY EPO | | Date de lévénement: | 11.11.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE | Effective DATE: | 20150911 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES | Effective DATE: | 20120704 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.02.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MA03 564818 AT T | Code Expl.: | -REVOCATION OF THE PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20150911 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150716 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.09.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Date de lévénement: | 22.07.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 17.07.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20150717 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.03.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.11.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.09.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION MODIFIED RELATED TO COMMUNICATION OF A NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATIONS + TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCOBS2 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.05.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |