Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Procédure dexamen | 21.07.2020 | Envoi dune notification signalant que la demande est réputée retirée, motif: {0}
[2020/50] | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 28.06.2012 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 28.06.2012 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 28.06.2012 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 28.06.2012 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 11.12.2012 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 12.12.2013 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 11.12.2014 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 10.12.2015 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 13.12.2016 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 12.12.2017 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 12.12.2018 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | 13.12.2019 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 11 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2012 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20120628 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2012 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 03.04.2013 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 11.06.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOKIA CORPORATION | | Date de l'événement: | 05.08.2015 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY | | Date de l'événement: | 11.07.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20180611 | | Date de l'événement: | 19.06.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20190522 | | Date de l'événement: | 04.09.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NOKIA TECHNOLOGIES OY | | Date de l'événement: | 23.10.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 30.10.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20191007 | | Date de l'événement: | 04.03.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 18.03.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20200219 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.01.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 11.02.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de l'événement: | 06.10.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 18.02.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.09.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION RELATED TO DISAPPROVAL OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT BY THE APPLICANT OR RESUMPTION OF EXAMINATION PROCEEDINGS BY THE EPO DELETED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSDIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 21.05.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 09.12.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | Effective DATE: | 20200630 | | Date de l'événement: | 28.09.2012 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 06.11.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION IS DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN | | Date de l'événement: | 11.02.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 29.01.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 06.10.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 16.09.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 21.05.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 08.06.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | |