Etats contractants désignés | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Procédure dexamen | 27.12.2019 | Demande rejetée, date d'effet juridique [2020/19] | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 12.12.2016 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 12.12.2016 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 12.12.2016 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 12.12.2016 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 12.12.2016 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 23.05.2017 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 11.05.2018 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 29.11.2019 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | Surtaxe | Surtaxe concernant la taxe annuelle | 31.05.2019 | 06   M06  
Taxe payée le  
29.11.2019 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 22.03.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Date de l'événement: | 22.03.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 22.03.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20161212 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.08.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C08K 5/10 20060101ALI20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C08L 71/02 20060101ALN20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09J 171/02 20060101ALI20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20180306 | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C08F 259/04 20060101ALI20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09J 127/06 20060101AFI20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C09J 4/06 20060101ALI20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 04.04.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | C08L 27/06 20060101ALN20180228BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 22.05.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20190417 | | Date de l'événement: | 27.12.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R003 | Code Expl.: | -REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL | | Date de l'événement: | 06.05.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | APPLICATION REFUSED | Effective DATE: | 20191227 | | Date de l'événement: | 17.02.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 03.04.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN REFUSED | | Date de l'événement: | 13.04.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 17.02.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 16.11.2016 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | |