Etats contractants désignés | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Procédure dexamen | 01.02.2021 | Demande rejetée, date d'effet juridique [2021/23] | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 29.08.2017 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 29.08.2017 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 29.08.2017 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 29.08.2017 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 29.08.2017 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 27.02.2018 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 26.07.2019 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 27.01.2020 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 27.01.2021 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Surtaxe | Surtaxe concernant la taxe annuelle | 31.01.2018 | 04   M06  
Taxe payée le  
27.02.2018 | 31.01.2019 | 05   M06  
Taxe payée le  
26.07.2019 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 06.12.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20170829 | | Date de l'événement: | 06.12.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 06.12.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Date de l'événement: | 09.05.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 05.09.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20180807 | | Date de l'événement: | 05.09.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 5/74 20060101ALI20180801BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 05.09.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04N 7/15 20060101AFI20180801BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | COOPER, JAMES, C, | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MCCORRY, KIERAN | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HAILPERN, JOSHUA | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | ALLEN, WILLIAM, J, | | Date de l'événement: | 09.10.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20190910 | | Date de l'événement: | 03.11.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 10.05.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN REFUSED | | Date de l'événement: | 06.09.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 03.11.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 15.06.2017 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 01.02.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R003 | Code Expl.: | -REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL | | Date de l'événement: | 09.06.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | APPLICATION REFUSED | Effective DATE: | 20210201 | | Date de l'événement: | 21.01.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | |