Etats contractants désignés | AL | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | AT | | BE | | BG | Extinction: 23.01.2020 | CH | | CY | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | CZ | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | EE | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | Extinction: 24.01.2020 | HR | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | HU | Extinction: 06.09.2016 | IE | | IS | Extinction: 23.02.2020 | IT | | LI | | LT | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | LU | | LV | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | MC | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | MK | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | MT | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | NL | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | NO | Extinction: 23.01.2020 | PL | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | PT | Extinction: 24.02.2020 | RO | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | RS | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | SE | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | SI | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | SK | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | SM | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | TR | Extinction: 23.10.2019 | Procédure d'examen | 29.07.2019 | Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s) | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 17.09.2018 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 16.09.2019 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 23.10.2019 | Procédure dopposition | 24.07.2020 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 30.09.2020 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 07.03.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Date de lévénement: | 07.03.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de lévénement: | 10.10.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20180904 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.10.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20190403 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.10.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de lévénement: | 23.10.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 14.11.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 502016007200 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Date de lévénement: | 15.11.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT REF 1192805 AT T | Code Expl.: | +REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT VALIDATED IN AUSTRIA) | Effective DATE: | 20191115 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.11.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | KELLER AND PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE AG, CH | | Date de lévénement: | 26.02.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG4D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200224 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200124 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200123 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200123 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200224 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.06.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2765653 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20200610 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON LAPSE IN CONTRACTING STATE DELETED | Ref Country Code: | IS | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20200223 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.07.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R097 502016007200 DE | Code Expl.: | +NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20200724 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | OWNER: | IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG, LI | Free Format Text: | FORMER OWNER: IVOCLAR VIVADENT AG, LI | | Date de lévénement: | 23.01.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FI FGE | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT VALIDATED IN FINLAND | | Date de lévénement: | 20.09.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200906 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.06.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG BE MM | Code Expl.: | -LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20200930 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200930 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2021 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20200906 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.08.2020 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.09.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2019 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de lévénement: | 07.09.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de lévénement: | 02.02.2018 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | TR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2022 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20191023 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.07.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20230607 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20230818 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Payment DATE: | 20230811 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20230817 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20230719 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20230816 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2023 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20230907 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.2024 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20231004 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2024 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20231001 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | |