Etats contractants désignés | AL | | AT | | BE | | BG | | CH | | CY | | CZ | | DE | | DK | | EE | | ES | | FI | | FR | | GB | | GR | | HR | | HU | | IE | | IS | | IT | | LI | | LT | | LU | | LV | | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | | NO | | PL | | PT | | RO | | RS | | SE | | SI | | SK | | SM | | TR | | Procédure d'examen | 12.01.2024 | Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s) | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 02.03.2020 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 01.03.2021 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 28.02.2022 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 28.02.2023 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 29.02.2024 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 10.04.2024 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 15.08.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 15.08.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Date de l'événement: | 27.03.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20190215 | | Date de l'événement: | 27.03.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTED) | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20210226 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.07.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 26.02.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 22.02.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 13.07.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE APPLICATION HAS BEEN PUBLISHED | | Date de l'événement: | 10.04.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 08.10.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 13.09.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.09.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 11.10.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20230914 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.01.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.03.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.03.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de l'événement: | 10.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 10.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de l'événement: | 15.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de l'événement: | 02.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602018067767 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Date de l'événement: | 08.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de l'événement: | 29.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR UNITARY EFFECT FILED | Effective DATE: | 20240424 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | UNITARY EFFECT REGISTERED | Designated State(s): | AT BE BG DE DK EE FI FR IT LT LU LV MT NL PT SE SI | Effective DATE: | 20240502 | |