Etats contractants désignés | AL | | AT | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | BE | | BG | Extinction: 20.03.2024 | CH | | CY | | CZ | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | DE | | DK | | EE | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | ES | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | FI | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | FR | | GB | | GR | Extinction: 21.03.2024 | HR | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | HU | | IE | | IS | Extinction: 20.04.2024 | IT | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | LI | | LT | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | LU | | LV | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | MC | | MK | | MT | | NL | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | NO | Extinction: 20.03.2024 | PL | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | PT | Extinction: 22.04.2024 | RO | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | RS | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | SE | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | SI | | SK | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | SM | Extinction: 20.12.2023 | TR | | État(s) autorisant la validation | KH | | MA | | MD | | TN | | Procédure d'examen | 08.11.2023 | Réception des traductions de la/des revendication(s) | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 14.02.2020 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 14.02.2020 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 14.02.2020 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 15.06.2020 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 14.06.2021 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 13.05.2022 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 31.03.2023 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | Brevet européen délivré | 20.12.2023 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 24.06.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 24.06.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20200214 | | Date de l'événement: | 24.06.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | BA ME | | Date de l'événement: | 18.11.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR VALIDATION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 18.11.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (DELETED) | | Date de l'événement: | 22.05.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 22.05.2020 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION WAS MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 22.02.2019 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE INTERNATIONAL PUBLICATION HAS BEEN MADE | | Date de l'événement: | 14.08.2018 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: UNKNOWN | | Date de l'événement: | 20.05.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: EXAMINATION IS IN PROGRESS | | Date de l'événement: | 23.06.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20210519 | | Date de l'événement: | 10.11.2021 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MICROSOFT TECHNOLOGY LICENSING, LLC | | Date de l'événement: | 29.06.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04L0029080000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L0012180000 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.07.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.07.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: GRANT OF PATENT IS INTENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 12/18 20060101AFI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | G06F 9/54 20060101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 45/302 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 9/40 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/10 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/1008 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 51/212 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 51/214 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 51/224 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/55 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/563 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/568 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 02.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L 67/63 20220101ALI20230629BHEP | | Date de l'événement: | 09.08.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INTENTION TO GRANT ANNOUNCED | Effective DATE: | 20230714 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.11.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de l'événement: | 17.11.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de l'événement: | 17.11.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: THE PATENT HAS BEEN GRANTED | | Date de l'événement: | 29.06.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R079 602018062912 DE | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENT OF IPC MAIN CLASS | Free Format Text: | PREVIOUS MAIN CLASS: H04L0029080000 | IPC CLASSIFICATION: | H04L0012180000 | | Date de l'événement: | 20.12.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | OPT-OUT OF THE COMPETENCE OF THE UNIFIED PATENT COURT (UPC) REGISTERED | Effective DATE: | 20231109 | | Date de l'événement: | 20.12.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AL AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MK MT NL NO PL PT RO RS SE SI SK SM TR | | Date de l'événement: | 20.12.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de l'événement: | 28.12.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R096 602018062912 DE | Code Expl.: | +DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT | | Date de l'événement: | 29.12.2023 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de l'événement: | 17.01.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de l'événement: | 08.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240321 | | Date de l'événement: | 10.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG LT MG9D | Code Expl.: | -INVALIDATION OF EXTENSION OF EUROPEAN PATENTS | | Date de l'événement: | 15.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 26.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 24.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG NL MP | Code Expl.: | -PATENT INVALID IN THE NETHERLANDS AS NO TRANSLATION HAS BEEN FILED | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BG | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240320 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240321 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 15.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MK05 1643413 AT T | Code Expl.: | -DELETION ACC. TO PAR. 5 (WITHDRAWAL OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT) | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 21.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | HR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LV | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240320 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.05.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240420 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de l'événement: | 10.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de l'événement: | 23.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 23.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CZ | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | EE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IS | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240420 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | RO | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SM | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.07.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20240521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.08.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240422 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.08.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.08.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20231220 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.08.2024 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20240422 | |