Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | Extinction: 31.10.1985 | CH | Extinction: 31.10.1985 | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | Extinction: 31.10.1985 | LU | Extinction: 31.10.1985 | NL | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 12.12.1984 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 29.09.1983 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 31.10.1984 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 10.04.1985 | Procédure dopposition | 11.01.1986 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 02.04.1986 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 24.05.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 14.04.1982 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 10.04.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 11.08.1982 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19820524 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.12.1984 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 10.04.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 12618 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19850415 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3169857 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19850515 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 08.06.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19931008 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 26.08.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | WAVIN B.V. | Effective DATE: | 19851031 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 81201117.9 | Effective DATE: | 19940510 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19960501 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.10.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19931008 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Effective DATE: | 19851031 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Effective DATE: | 19851031 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.07.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Effective DATE: | 19940701 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 19940630 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.10.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19931008 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Effective DATE: | 19851031 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19851031 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19960501 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19931009 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.10.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 19921005 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19921009 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.10.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19921026 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.11.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19921102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19941031 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19920930 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.02.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.02.1982 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.02.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 10.02.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |