Etats contractants désignés | AT | | DE | | NL | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 10.04.1984 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 15.03.1983 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 27.01.1984 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 01.08.1984 | Procédure dopposition | 03.05.1985 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 07.08.1985 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 07.08.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 14.10.1981 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1984 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.1981 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19811026 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1984 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 8779 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19840815 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 06.09.1984 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3165175 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19840906 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 81301428.9 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: CEASED DUE TO REACHING THE MAXIMUM LIFETIME OF A PATENT | Effective DATE: | 20010402 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.06.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 81301428.9 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20010402 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20010402 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 20010429 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.03.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20000314 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.04.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20000427 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.03.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20000320 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.04.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20000405 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.06.1984 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.08.1981 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.06.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 03.06.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |