Etats contractants désignés | AT | | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | NL | | Procédure d'examen | 27.01.1988 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 22.01.1987 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 19.01.1988 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 29.06.1988 | Procédure dopposition | 30.03.1989 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 14.06.1989 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 08.04.1987 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED (DELETED) | | Date de lévénement: | 14.10.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 14.06.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 16.09.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 25.09.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 07.08.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 28.08.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 29.06.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19860227 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.11.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19861013 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.06.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 35480 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19880715 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 04.08.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3563577 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19880804 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 10.08.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 27.11.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 28.01.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19910128 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.10.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Effective DATE: | 19911001 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 19920930 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.01.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19910128 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19910801 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 19900122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.03.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19900326 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.01.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19910118 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19891231 | Year of Fee Payment: | 06 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19890131 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.05.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.06.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.06.1985 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.04.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 24.04.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |