Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | | CH | | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LI | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 25.05.1989 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 09.03.1988 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 23.03.1989 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 18.10.1989 | Procédure dopposition | 19.07.1990 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 26.09.1990 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 29.11.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | | Date de lévénement: | 05.01.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 26.09.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 10.12.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE | | Date de lévénement: | 18.10.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE FR GB IT LI SE | | Date de lévénement: | 18.03.1987 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19870109 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.11.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19880919 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.10.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 47354 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19891115 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 20.10.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 23.11.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3666384 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19891123 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 07.01.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19970515 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 27.03.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 86106583.7 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | FLACHGLAS A.G. | Effective DATE: | 19970531 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.02.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 86106583.7 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19970515 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Effective DATE: | 19970531 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970531 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990302 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.01.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19980130 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19970515 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970531 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.05.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19970516 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 19960523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 19960528 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.06.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 19960604 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.03.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19970329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19960517 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19960503 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19960528 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050515 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.09.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.10.1986 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.08.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 09.08.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |