Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | NL | | Procédure d'examen | 28.10.1992 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 10.09.1988 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 09.09.1989 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 04.09.1990 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 12.09.1991 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 16.09.1992 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 28.04.1993 | Recours après examen | 25.07.1991 | APPEAL FILED | 04.09.1991 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 24.09.1992 | APPEAL RESULT | Procédure dopposition | 29.01.1994 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 13.04.1994 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 18.06.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 20.04.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 16.06.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 15.04.1987 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 10.05.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 28.04.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT NL | | Date de lévénement: | 20.09.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19890726 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.03.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19900208 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.06.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3688352 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930603 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 26.07.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 08.09.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 19930809 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.05.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19981004 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.07.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 06.08.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF THE APPLICANT RENOUNCES | Effective DATE: | 19980806 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.10.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19981004 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19950501 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.09.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19970922 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19970915 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19970915 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19931031 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.10.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20051004 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.10.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 12.03.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.03.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1987 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.03.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 03.03.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |