Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | Procédure d'examen | 24.09.1992 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 23.05.1990 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 21.05.1991 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 18.05.1992 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | Brevet européen délivré | 30.12.1992 | Procédure dopposition | 01.10.1993 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 15.12.1993 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 12.03.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 22.12.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 04.01.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Date de lévénement: | 23.08.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19890621 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.05.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19900323 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.02.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3877068 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930211 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 24.03.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | SOCIETA' ITALIANA BREVETTI S.P.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.11.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20070620 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20070625 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.06.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20070621 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20070608 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.07.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB PE20 | Code Expl.: | -PATENT EXPIRED AFTER TERMINATION OF 20 YEARS | Expiry DATE: | 20080623 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.11.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 20080623 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.11.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.11.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.11.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 04.11.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |