Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 24.06.1997 | BE | Extinction: 30.06.1997 | CH | Extinction: 30.06.1997 | DE | | ES | Extinction: 25.06.1997 | FR | | GB | Extinction: 24.06.1997 | IT | | LI | Extinction: 30.06.1997 | LU | Extinction: 24.06.1997 | NL | | SE | Extinction: 25.06.1997 | Procédure d'examen | 14.09.1992 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 25.05.1990 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 14.05.1991 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 21.05.1992 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | Brevet européen délivré | 23.12.1992 | Procédure dopposition | 10.09.1997 | Effet juridique du rejet de l'opposition | publié le 03.12.1997 | Recours après opposition | 03.11.1994 | APPEAL FILED | 14.01.1995 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 10.09.1997 | APPEAL RESULT | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | LU: LAST PAID ANNUAL FEE | | Date de lévénement: | 02.02.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | | Date de lévénement: | 25.01.1989 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 02.05.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 23.12.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 29.08.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19900615 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.06.1991 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19910513 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.12.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 83695 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930115 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 04.02.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 3876884 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19930204 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 08.02.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | BARZANO' E ZANARDO MILANO S.P.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 14.04.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 19930312 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.02.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19970624 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2036713 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 13.02.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 17.04.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 16.03.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20000201 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.11.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | SMS SCHLOEMANN-SIEMAG AG | Effective DATE: | 19930917 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.01.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | SMS SCHLOEMANN -SIEMAG AG | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 88730140.6 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 03.12.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Effective DATE: | 19970910 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | MANNESMANN A.G. | Effective DATE: | 19970630 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.03.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 88730140.6 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 02.03.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19980101 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Effective DATE: | 19970624 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Effective DATE: | 19970630 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970630 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030101 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF EXPIRATION OF PROTECTION | Effective DATE: | 19970625 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.02.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19980227 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970624 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970630 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19970624 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Effective DATE: | 19980101 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Effective DATE: | 19970625 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 19960523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 19960524 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 19960524 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.06.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20010611 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.06.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 19960618 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19960521 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19960516 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 19960501 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 19960529 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19960523 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.06.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050624 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.10.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 11.10.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL DOSSIER MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS NOAPO | | Date de lévénement: | 06.11.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.03.1990 | | Description de lévénement: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.12.1988 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.10.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: OPPOSITION REJECTED | | Date de lévénement: | 17.10.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION REJECTED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009273 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.09.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |