Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 12.06.1999 | BE | Extinction: 30.06.1999 | CH | Extinction: 30.06.1999 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 10.06.1999 | ES | Extinction: 14.06.1999 | FR | Extinction: 10.03.1999 | GB | Extinction: 10.03.1999 | GR | Extinction: 10.03.1999 | IT | | LI | Extinction: 30.06.1999 | LU | Extinction: 12.06.1999 | NL | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 15.07.1998 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 27.12.1993 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 30.12.1994 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 29.12.1995 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 27.12.1996 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 30.12.1997 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 30.12.1998 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | Surtaxe | Surtaxe concernant la taxe annuelle | 30.06.1993 | 03   M06  
Taxe payée le  
27.12.1993 | 30.06.1994 | 04   M06  
Taxe payée le  
30.12.1994 | 30.06.1995 | 05   M06  
Taxe payée le  
29.12.1995 | 30.06.1996 | 06   M06  
Taxe payée le  
27.12.1996 | 30.06.1997 | 07   M06  
Taxe payée le  
30.12.1997 | 30.06.1998 | 08   M06  
Taxe payée le  
30.12.1998 | Brevet européen délivré | 10.03.1999 | Procédure dopposition | 11.12.1999 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 23.02.2000 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 01.03.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 16.12.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FR GB GR IT LI LU NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 25.08.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19930616 | | Date de lévénement: | 06.07.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19940519 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 177327 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19990315 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 15.04.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69130979 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19990415 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 19990310 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PFA | Code Expl.: | NAME/FIRM CHANGED | Free Format Text: | TRADOTEC S.A.,CHEMIN DES COQUELICOTS 16,1214 VERNIER (CH) TRANSFER- TRADOTEC S.A.,CHEMIN DES ROUSSES 2,1293 BELLEVUE (CH) | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2131508 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 15.02.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | S.A. TRADOTEC | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.03.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20000101 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.02.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 91810445.6 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 16.07.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20020603 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990612 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000601 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19990610 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990614 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19990310 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19990310 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990310 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990612 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000101 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.06.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000613 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19990610 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.06.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050612 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.07.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 21.04.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.1992 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.01.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 14.01.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |