Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 25.07.1994 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 30.12.1992 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 30.12.1992 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 30.12.1992 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 27.05.1993 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 27.05.1994 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 26.10.1994 | Procédure dopposition | 27.07.1995 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 18.10.1995 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 17.02.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 18.10.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 26.10.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 12.05.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19921230 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19931213 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.10.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | BARZANO'E ZANARDO S.P.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69104839 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19941201 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19990607 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.07.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE IN SWEDEN | Ref Document Number: | 91915193.6 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 91915193.6 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 03.05.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000503 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19990630 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19990607 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19990629 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 19980527 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19980520 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19980526 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19980522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.06.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20050607 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.03.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.09.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 26.08.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 26.08.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |