Etats contractants désignés | AT | | DE | | ES | Extinction: 28.02.1996 | FR | Extinction: 28.02.1996 | GB | Extinction: 28.02.1996 | NL | Extinction: 28.02.1996 | Procédure d'examen | 17.11.1995 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 26.05.1994 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 24.05.1995 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 28.02.1996 | Procédure dopposition | 29.11.1996 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 19.02.1997 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 26.07.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.08.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Date de lévénement: | 19.02.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 24.11.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE ES FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE ES FR GB NL | | Date de lévénement: | 25.05.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19940323 | | Date de lévénement: | 06.09.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19950724 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 134599 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19960315 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 04.04.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59205504 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19960404 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 28.08.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 19960228 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MAURER SOEHNE GMBH & CO. KG | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | MAURER SOEHNE GMBH & CO. KG | | Date de lévénement: | 20.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040520 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041201 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | THE PATENT HAS BEEN ANNULLED BY A DECISION OF A NATIONAL AUTHORITY | Effective DATE: | 19960228 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Effective DATE: | 19960228 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Effective DATE: | 19960228 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 19960228 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.05.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20030522 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20030729 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.10.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 03.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |