Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 22.09.1995 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 30.11.1994 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 27.11.1995 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 28.02.1996 | Procédure dopposition | 29.11.1996 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 19.02.1997 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 21.06.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 19.02.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 28.02.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 26.01.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19930107 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.11.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19941010 | | Date de lévénement: | 04.04.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69208653 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19960404 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 07.05.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | BUGNION S.P.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 23.08.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 19991230 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.10.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de lévénement: | 14.08.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED | Ref Document Number: | 92311862.4 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | F | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20000831 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19991230 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 19991231 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20070131 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.12.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 19981202 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.12.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 19981203 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.12.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 19981203 | Year of Fee Payment: | 07 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20080701 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20051230 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.01.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.12.1993 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 03.01.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |