Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | Procédure d'examen | 04.02.1997 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 30.11.1995 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 29.11.1996 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 04.06.1997 | Procédure dopposition | 05.03.1998 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 27.05.1998 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 19.09.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 27.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Date de lévénement: | 04.06.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB IT | | Date de lévénement: | 25.01.1995 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19941129 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.09.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19960801 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.07.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69311268 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19970710 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.07.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20061124 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.08.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20070731 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.11.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20061124 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.06.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20070601 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.11.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20051117 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.11.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20051108 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.11.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20051123 | Year of Fee Payment: | 13 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20061130 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20061130 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20071124 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.04.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.02.1997 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 14.11.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 30.07.1996 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 15.04.1994 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.04.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 09.04.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |