Etats contractants désignés | AT | | BE | | DE | | DK | | ES | | FR | | GB | | IT | | LU | | NL | | Procédure d'examen | 22.12.1997 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 19.07.1996 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 19.07.1996 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 19.07.1996 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 16.12.1996 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 22.12.1997 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 01.04.1998 | Procédure d'opposition | 13.02.2002 | Taxe d'impression d'un nouveau fascicule payée | | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 10.07.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de l'événement: | 02.10.1996 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL | | Date de l'événement: | 01.04.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL | | Date de l'événement: | 02.05.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE DE DK ES FR GB IT LU NL | | Date de l'événement: | 02.10.1996 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19960719 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.10.1996 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 19960918 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.04.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 164540 | Country of Ref Document: | AT | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19980415 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | T | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de l'événement: | 27.04.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | IT: TRANSLATION FOR A EP PATENT FILED | OWNER: | GUZZI E RAVIZZA S.R.L. | | Date de l'événement: | 07.05.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59501780 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 19980507 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de l'événement: | 17.06.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 19980522 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.05.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2114304 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de l'événement: | 19.10.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T3 | Code Expl.: | +EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Date de l'événement: | 01.01.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Date de l'événement: | 09.12.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH | Effective DATE: | 19981017 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.02.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH | | Date de l'événement: | 06.12.2000 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SMS DEMAG AG | | Date de l'événement: | 01.02.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: MODIFICATIONS (OF NAMES), TAKEN FROM THE EUROPEAN PATENT PATENT BULLETIN | OWNER: | SMS DEMAG AG | | Date de l'événement: | 01.08.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO | OPPONENT: | VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH | | Date de l'événement: | 02.05.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20020502 | | Date de l'événement: | 17.06.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK T4 | Code Expl.: | AMENDED EP PATENT WITH DANISH CLAIMS | | Date de l'événement: | 01.07.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: DECISION OF OPPOSITION | | Date de l'événement: | 24.07.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977) | | Date de l'événement: | 09.08.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION | | Date de l'événement: | 01.10.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: RECEIPT OF MODIFIED TRANSLATIONS IN THE NETHERLANDS LANGUAGE AFTER AN OPPOSITION PROCEDURE | | Date de l'événement: | 16.11.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES DC2A T5 | Code Expl.: | PATENT MODIFIED | Effective DATE: | 20020704 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.05.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | VOEST-ALPINE INDUSTRIEANLAGENBAU GMBH | Effective DATE: | 19981017 | | Date de l'événement: | 22.08.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | TITLE (CORRECTION) | Free Format Text: | PROCESS FOR PRODUCING THIN SLABS | | Date de l'événement: | 08.09.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DK EBP | Code Expl.: | -EP PATENT LAPSED | | Date de l'événement: | 01.10.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20030801 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | | Date de l'événement: | 16.08.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20030121 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.01.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030131 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.01.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030131 | | Date de l'événement: | 21.01.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030121 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.09.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030930 | | Date de l'événement: | 20.01.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030120 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.08.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20030801 | | Date de l'événement: | 20.02.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Payment DATE: | 20020220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 02.01.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Payment DATE: | 20020102 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 18.01.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20020118 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 26.12.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20011226 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 27.12.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Payment DATE: | 20011227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 27.12.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Payment DATE: | 20011227 | Year of Fee Payment: | 08 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2010 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20100121 | Year of Fee Payment: | 16 | | Date de l'événement: | 28.09.2011 | | Description de l'événement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20110120 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.11.2011 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110120 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.06.2012 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20120126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 18 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2013 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20130122 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Date de l'événement: | 28.06.2013 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20130111 | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Date de l'événement: | 15.09.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG AT MM01 164540 AT T | Code Expl.: | -LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140120 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.08.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 59501780 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | | Date de l'événement: | 30.10.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 59501780 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20140801 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.10.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140801 | | Date de l'événement: | 28.11.2014 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140120 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2016 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20140120 | | Date de l'événement: | 15.03.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.02.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.01.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de l'événement: | 23.09.1997 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de l'événement: | 23.09.1997 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de l'événement: | 05.08.1997 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de l'événement: | 16.08.1996 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 15.03.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Date de l'événement: | 22.11.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | INTERLOCUTORY DECISION IN OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IDOP | | Date de l'événement: | 03.08.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | INTERLOCUTORY DECISION IN OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IDOP | | Date de l'événement: | 13.04.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Date de l'événement: | 09.04.2001 | | Description de l'événement: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | | Date de l'événement: | 12.07.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Date de l'événement: | 23.06.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Date de l'événement: | 01.02.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OBSO | | Date de l'événement: | 23.10.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Date de l'événement: | 22.10.1998 | | Description de l'événement: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |