Etats contractants désignés | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | Extinction: 09.10.2003 | IT | | NL | Extinction: 09.07.2003 | SE | Extinction: 09.10.2003 | Procédure d'examen | 17.02.2003 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 06.04.1998 | Traduction produite | | 06.04.1998 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 06.04.1998 | Taxe de recherche payée | | 06.04.1998 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 06.04.1998 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 20.10.1998 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 18.10.1999 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 26.10.2000 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 25.10.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 17.10.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 09.07.2003 | Procédure dopposition | 14.04.2004 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 30.06.2004 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 05.08.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE ES FR GB IT NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 05.08.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19980406 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ASAHI KASEI KABUSHIKI KAISHA | | Date de lévénement: | 22.08.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A4 | Designated State(s): | DE ES FR GB IT NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 22.08.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT DRAWN UP AND DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20010709 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.08.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | Free Format Text: | 7B 01D 71/68 A, 7B 01D 71/28 B, 7B 01D 71/38 B, 7B 01D 67/00 B | | Date de lévénement: | 30.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20011218 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | DE ES FR GB IT NL SE | | Date de lévénement: | 14.08.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69629042 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030814 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 09.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2197249 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Date de lévénement: | 14.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 02.06.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20031009 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040414 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20031009 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030709 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.10.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20031009 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20091001 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.01.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20091023 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20091029 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20091016 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20110630 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20101102 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.11.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20111118 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20101009 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20101010 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.06.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110502 | | Date de lévénement: | 08.09.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 69629042 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20110502 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.05.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 07.10.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 19.06.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 14.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |