Etats contractants désignés | CH | | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | Extinction: 02.07.2003 | LI | | Procédure d'examen | 02.05.2003 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 31.08.1999 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 31.08.2000 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 31.08.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 02.09.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | Brevet européen délivré | 02.07.2003 | Procédure dopposition | 05.04.2004 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 23.06.2004 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 02.04.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | ASULAB S.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 03.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | CH DE FR GB IT LI | | Date de lévénement: | 03.11.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19990903 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.11.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | CH DE FR GB IT LI | | Date de lévénement: | 02.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | CH DE FR GB IT LI | | Date de lévénement: | 07.08.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69723253 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030807 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 15.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de lévénement: | 02.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | ICB INGENIEURS CONSEILS EN BREVETS SA | | Date de lévénement: | 26.11.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977) | Effective DATE: | 20031103 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.06.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20040405 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20110728 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.04.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20120829 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20120829 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.07.2015 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 19 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.07.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR PLFP | Code Expl.: | +FEE PAYMENT | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20160721 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20160726 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2016 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20160720 | Year of Fee Payment: | 20 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.08.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R071 69723253 DE | Code Expl.: | -EXPIRY OF RIGHT | | Date de lévénement: | 15.09.2017 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de lévénement: | 02.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT;WARNING: LAPSES OF ITALIAN PATENTS WITH EFFECTIVE DATE BEFORE 2007 MAY HAVE OCCURRED AT ANY TIME BEFORE 2007. THE CORRECT EFFECTIVE DATE MAY BE DIFFERENT FROM THE ONE RECORDED. | Effective DATE: | 20030702 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.05.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 25.10.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 15.01.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 07.05.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |