Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | GB | | Procédure d'examen | 02.10.2007 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 30.12.1999 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 28.12.2000 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 31.12.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 30.12.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 30.12.2003 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | 30.12.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 08 | 28.12.2005 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 09 | 21.12.2006 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 10 | Brevet européen délivré | 05.12.2007 | Procédure dopposition | 08.09.2008 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 12.11.2008 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 01.07.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Date de lévénement: | 01.07.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 07.02.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A3 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 07.02.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 07.02.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION PROVIDED ON IPC CODE ASSIGNED BEFORE GRANT | Free Format Text: | 7B 41J 2/447 A, 7G 06K 15/12 B | | Date de lévénement: | 26.09.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20010724 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.10.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | DE FR GB | | Date de lévénement: | 08.09.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20040721 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR GB | | Date de lévénement: | 05.12.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 17.01.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69738346 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20080117 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 04.04.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 12.11.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20080908 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20101215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20101215 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20111219 | Year of Fee Payment: | 15 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.08.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20121218 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.09.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20130830 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.10.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130702 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.11.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20121218 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.11.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20130102 | | Date de lévénement: | 17.10.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 69738346 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20130702 | | Date de lévénement: | 02.11.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.10.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.12.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.05.1998 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 10.10.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 10.10.2008 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |