Etats contractants désignés | DE | | FR | | IT | | Procédure d'examen | 30.12.2004 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 31.08.2000 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 31.08.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 02.09.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 01.09.2003 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | 31.08.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 07 | Brevet européen délivré | 09.03.2005 | Procédure dopposition | 12.12.2005 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 01.03.2006 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20021122 | | Date de lévénement: | 12.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Designated State(s): | DE FR IT | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A2 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 10.03.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 22.05.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 22.10.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20030904 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.04.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | DELPHI TECHNOLOGIES, INC. | | Date de lévénement: | 09.03.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE FR IT | | Date de lévénement: | 14.04.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69829251 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20050414 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 06.04.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | | Date de lévénement: | 30.12.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 01.03.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20051212 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.10.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20090814 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20090730 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20090814 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 20.05.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20110502 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100807 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110301 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100831 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.06.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 69829251 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20110301 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 14.01.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.08.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de lévénement: | 05.04.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | SEARCH REPORT DESPATCHED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009013 | | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 13.01.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 13.01.2006 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |