Etats contractants désignés | DE | | ES | | FR | | GB | | IT | | PT | | Procédure d'examen | 29.06.2001 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 13.12.2000 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 13.12.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 03.04.2002 | Procédure dopposition | 06.01.2003 | Aucune opposition formée dans le délai imparti | publié le 26.03.2003 | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 16.08.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 30.08.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT SC4A | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE | Free Format Text: | AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION | Effective DATE: | 20020531 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.11.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2175626 ES T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 26.03.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20030106 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | DE ES FR GB IT PT | | Date de lévénement: | 09.06.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de lévénement: | 01.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | MIOZZO,MARIA FILOMENA PADRON | | Date de lévénement: | 22.12.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19991026 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.02.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | DE ES FR GB IT PT | | Date de lévénement: | 24.05.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20000407 | | Date de lévénement: | 01.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB IF02 | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01 | | Date de lévénement: | 16.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | NATURA COSMETICOS S.A. | | Date de lévénement: | 03.04.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | DE ES FR GB IT PT | | Date de lévénement: | 08.05.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69804574 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20020508 | Format of Ref Document F/P: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 27.02.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Payment DATE: | 20081112 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20081223 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20090120 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20081212 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.05.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20081127 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20081126 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.06.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG PT MM4A | Code Expl.: | -ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100601 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.07.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100601 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.08.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20091201 | | Date de lévénement: | 24.09.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20100831 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.10.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091231 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100701 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.12.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091201 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.03.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091201 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.07.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110329 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.04.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FD2A | Code Expl.: | -ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN | Effective DATE: | 20110411 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.09.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20091202 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.02.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 11.07.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 05.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 05.04.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 11.01.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS AGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 23.04.1999 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 07.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | | Date de lévénement: | 07.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | NO OPPOSITION FILED WITHIN TIME LIMIT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009261 | |