Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 16.12.2004 | BE | Extinction: 31.12.2004 | CH | | CY | Extinction: 31.03.2004 | DE | | DK | Extinction: 30.06.2004 | ES | | FI | Extinction: 31.03.2004 | FR | | GB | Extinction: 31.03.2004 | GR | Extinction: 30.06.2004 | IE | Extinction: 31.03.2004 | IT | | LI | | LU | Extinction: 16.12.2004 | MC | Extinction: 31.12.2004 | NL | Extinction: 31.03.2004 | PT | Extinction: 31.08.2004 | SE | Extinction: 30.06.2004 | Procédure d'examen | 22.12.2003 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 02.01.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 02.01.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | 02.01.2003 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 05 | 02.01.2004 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 06 | Brevet européen délivré | 31.03.2004 | Procédure d'opposition | 21.05.2007 | Envoi de la notification signalant la révocation du brevet | | Données INPADOC Tooltip | L'OEB n'est pas responsable de l'exactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à l'égard d'un but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de l'événement: | 18.12.2002 | | Description de l'événement: | FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT DESPATCHED | Effective DATE: | 20021104 | | Date de l'événement: | 02.05.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | SPIRIG PHARMA AG | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Free Format Text: | AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI | | Date de l'événement: | 08.03.2000 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de l'événement: | 08.03.2000 | | Description de l'événement: | EXTENSION FEES PAID | Free Format Text: | LT PAYMENT 19991230;LV PAYMENT 19991230;RO PAYMENT 19991230 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.03.2000 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 19991230 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B1 | Designated State(s): | AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT | Countries concerned: | LT LV RO | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH EP | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT TAKES EFFECT AS A NATIONAL PATENT IN CH/LI | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | Free Format Text: | NOT ENGLISH | | Date de l'événement: | 06.05.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 59811094 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20040506 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de l'événement: | 05.05.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND | Free Format Text: | GERMAN | | Date de l'événement: | 15.06.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH NV | Code Expl.: | NEW AGENT | REPRESENTATIVE: | BRAUN & PARTNER PATENT-, MARKEN-, RECHTSANWAELTE | | Date de l'événement: | 27.09.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.09.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977 [NO TRANSLATION FILED] | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.10.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT | | Date de l'événement: | 01.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG IE FD4D | Code Expl.: | -EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID | | Date de l'événement: | 17.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de l'événement: | 09.02.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | HENKEL KGAA | Effective DATE: | 20041220 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.02.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | HENKEL KGAA | Effective DATE: | 20041220 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.02.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | BEIERSDORF AG | Effective DATE: | 20041224 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG ES FG2A 2219863 T3 | Code Expl.: | +DEFINITIVE PROTECTION | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *SPIRIG PHARMA A.G. | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Date de l'événement: | 17.10.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | PATENT REVOKED | Effective DATE: | 20070329 | | Date de l'événement: | 15.10.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG CH PL | Code Expl.: | -PATENT CEASED | | Date de l'événement: | 02.01.2008 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | PT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20040831 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041216 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | BE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CY | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DK | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FI | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | LU | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041216 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | MC | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.03.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | NL | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040331 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.06.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20040630 | | Date de l'événement: | 21.12.2006 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | CH | Payment DATE: | 20061221 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de l'événement: | 29.12.2006 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20061229 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de l'événement: | 20.12.2006 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | ES | Payment DATE: | 20061220 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.12.2006 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20061231 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de l'événement: | 30.04.2008 | | Description de l'événement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20061229 | Year of Fee Payment: | 09 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.12.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | BE: LAPSED | OWNER: | *SPIRIG PHARMA A.G. | Effective DATE: | 20041231 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.02.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de l'événement: | 14.01.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | GRANT FEE PAID | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR3 | | Date de l'événement: | 08.08.2003 | | Description de l'événement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNIGR1 | | Date de l'événement: | 13.05.1999 | | Description de l'événement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de l'événement: | 14.09.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT REVOKED | | Date de l'événement: | 14.09.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | PATENT REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009271 | | Date de l'événement: | 16.05.2007 | | Description de l'événement: | COMMUNICATION DESPATCHED THAT PATENT IS REVOKED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNREV1 | | Date de l'événement: | 11.08.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Date de l'événement: | 07.06.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Date de l'événement: | 01.02.2005 | | Description de l'événement: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Date de l'événement: | 31.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Date de l'événement: | 24.12.2004 | | Description de l'événement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | |