Etats contractants désignés | AT | Extinction: 19.02.2003 | DE | | FR | | GB | | IT | | SE | | Procédure d'examen | 04.12.2002 | Taxe publication/d‘impression payée | Entrée dans la phase régionale | 11.09.2000 | Taxe nationale de base payée | | 11.09.2000 | Taxe(s) de désignation payée(s) | | 11.09.2000 | Taxe d'examen payée | | Taxes payées | Taxe annuelle | 16.03.2001 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 03 | 13.03.2002 | Taxe annuelle Année du brevet 04 | Brevet européen délivré | 19.02.2003 | Procédure d'opposition | 16.12.2009 | Taxe d'impression d'un nouveau fascicule payée | | Recours après opposition | 01.02.2007 | APPEAL FILED | 29.03.2007 | APPEAL STATEMENT OF GROUNDS FILED | 22.07.2009 | APPEAL RESULT | Données INPADOC Tooltip | LOEB nest pas responsable de lexactitude des données relatives à la situation juridique dans la phase post-délivrance, y compris - et sans restriction - de leur exhaustivité, de leur actualité ou de leur pertinence à légard dun but spécifique. Pour obtenir des informations officielles, veuillez vous adresser aux services nationaux de la propriété industrielle compétents. | Date de lévénement: | 22.01.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HAKANSON, CARL | | Date de lévénement: | 05.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON INVENTOR PROVIDED BEFORE GRANT (CORRECTED) | INVENTOR: | HAKANSON, CARL | | Date de lévénement: | 19.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 27.03.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | CORRESPONDS TO: | Ref Document Number: | 69905457 | Country of Ref Document: | DE | DATE OF REF DOCUMENT: | 20030327 | Kind Code of Ref Document: | P | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | A1 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2001 | | Description de lévénement: | REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED | Effective DATE: | 20000911 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.01.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (APPLICANT DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER KARLSTAD AKTIEBOLAG | | Date de lévénement: | 19.02.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB FG4D | Code Expl.: | +EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED | | Date de lévénement: | 18.07.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | FR: TRANSLATION FILED | | Date de lévénement: | 07.01.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | OPPONENT: | VOITH PAPER PATENT GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20031112 | | Date de lévénement: | 18.08.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER, INC. | | Date de lévénement: | 18.08.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG GB 732E | Code Expl.: | AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977) | | Date de lévénement: | 08.12.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | PARTY DATA CHANGED (PATENT OWNER DATA CHANGED OR RIGHTS OF A PATENT TRANSFERRED) | OWNER: | METSO PAPER, INC. | | Date de lévénement: | 25.02.2005 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR TP | Code Expl.: | TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY | | Date de lévénement: | 27.06.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTED) | OPPONENT: | VOITH PATENT GMBH | Effective DATE: | 20031112 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.04.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Payment DATE: | 20090317 | Year of Fee Payment: | 11 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.01.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Effective DATE: | 20100127 | | Date de lévénement: | 27.01.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES | Kind Code of Ref Document: | B2 | Designated State(s): | AT DE FR GB IT SE | | Date de lévénement: | 29.04.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG SE TRGR | Code Expl.: | +TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Payment DATE: | 20100402 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | AT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT | Effective DATE: | 20030219 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.06.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Payment DATE: | 20100322 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.08.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Payment DATE: | 20100329 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 30.11.2010 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Payment DATE: | 20100312 | Year of Fee Payment: | 12 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.11.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Date de lévénement: | 23.12.2011 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG FR ST | Code Expl.: | -NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE | Effective DATE: | 20111130 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | FR | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110331 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | GB | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Date de lévénement: | 29.02.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | IT | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20110310 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.05.2012 | | Description de lévénement: | ANNUAL FEE PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Payment DATE: | 20120323 | Year of Fee Payment: | 14 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.07.2013 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | SE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20100603 | | Date de lévénement: | 09.01.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | REFERENCE TO A NATIONAL CODE | Event code: | REG DE R119 69905457 DE | Code Expl.: | -APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE | Effective DATE: | 20131001 | | Date de lévénement: | 31.01.2014 | | Description de lévénement: | LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE [ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORMATION FROM NATIONAL OFFICE TO EPO] | Ref Country Code: | DE | Free Format Text: | LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES | Effective DATE: | 20131001 | | Date de lévénement: | 03.04.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 03.02.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL REFERENCE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSCREFNO | | Date de lévénement: | 03.02.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF NOTICE OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA2O | | Date de lévénement: | 13.12.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 26.08.2002 | | Description de lévénement: | DESPATCH OF COMMUNICATION OF INTENTION TO GRANT A PATENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS IGRA | | Date de lévénement: | 24.07.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | APPEAL PROCEDURE CLOSED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA9O | | Date de lévénement: | 05.04.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | DATE OF RECEIPT OF STATEMENT OF GROUNDS OF APPEAL RECORDED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNNOA3O | | Date de lévénement: | 04.01.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | (EXPECTED) GRANT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009210 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.12.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | PATENT MAINTAINED IN AMENDED FORM | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009272 | | Date de lévénement: | 15.12.2000 | | Description de lévénement: | PUBLIC REFERENCE MADE UNDER ARTICLE 153(3) EPC TO A PUBLISHED INTERNATIONAL APPLICATION THAT HAS ENTERED THE EUROPEAN PHASE | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009012 | | Date de lévénement: | 25.12.2009 | | Description de lévénement: | INFORMATION ON THE STATUS OF AN EP PATENT APPLICATION OR GRANTED EP PATENT | Free Format Text: | STATUS: PATENT MAINTAINED AS AMENDED | | Date de lévénement: | 25.05.2007 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION DATA, OPPONENT'S DATA OR THAT OF THE OPPONENT'S REPRESENTATIVE MODIFIED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009299OPPO | | Date de lévénement: | 26.04.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | REPLY OF PATENT PROPRIETOR TO NOTICE(S) OF OPPOSITION RECEIVED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS3 | | Date de lévénement: | 28.01.2004 | | Description de lévénement: | NOTICE OF OPPOSITION AND REQUEST TO FILE OBSERVATION + TIME LIMIT SENT | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOSNOBS2 | | Date de lévénement: | 21.11.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | OPPOSITION FILED | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: 0009260 | | Date de lévénement: | 19.11.2003 | | Description de lévénement: | UNPUBLISHED CHANGE TO OPPONENT DATA | Free Format Text: | ORIGINAL CODE: EPIDOS OPPO | |