EP1029497 - Household apparatus with water circulation , in particular household dishwasher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 14.09.2007 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.12.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): PT | published on 16.01.2008 [2008/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Carl-Wery-Strasse 34 81739 München / DE | [2004/05] |
Former [2000/34] | For all designated states BSH Bosch und Siemens Hausgeräte GmbH Hochstrasse 17 81669 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stickel, Ernst Hirschstrasse 24 89537 Giengen / DE | 02 /
Jerg, Helmut Ringental 15 89537 Giengen / DE | 03 /
Rosenbauer, Michael Riedweg 19 86756 Reimlingen / DE | 04 /
Schessl, Bernd Brand-Erbisdorfer-Strasse 6 89407 Dillingen / DE | [2000/34] | Application number, filing date | 00101982.7 | 01.02.2000 | [2000/34] | Priority number, date | DE1999107074 | 19.02.1999 Original published format: DE 19907074 | [2000/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1029497 | Date: | 23.08.2000 | Language: | DE | [2000/34] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1029497 | Date: | 22.11.2000 | [2000/47] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1029497 | Date: | 23.06.2004 | Language: | DE | [2004/26] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | A47L15/42, A47L15/46 | [2000/47] | CPC: |
A47L15/0052 (EP);
A47L15/0031 (EP);
A47L15/4225 (EP);
A47L2401/09 (EP);
A47L2501/05 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2000/34] | A47L15/42 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2000/34] | Title | German: | Wasserführendes Haushaltgerät, insbesondere Haushalt-Geschirrspülmaschine | [2000/34] | English: | Household apparatus with water circulation , in particular household dishwasher | [2000/34] | French: | Appareil domestique à circulation d'eau , en particulier machine à laver la vaisselle | [2000/34] | Examination procedure | 22.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/03] | 16.12.2003 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2004 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2004 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
23.03.2005
07.04.2005
ADMISSIBLE AEG Hausgeräte GmbH Muggenhofer Strasse 135 D-90429 Nürnberg / DE | [2005/20] | 27.04.2005 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 07.11.2005 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 24.04.2007 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2007/42] | 24.04.2007 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.06.2007 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 04.06.2007 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.02.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 01.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FI | 23.06.2004 | IE | 23.06.2004 | NL | 23.06.2004 | DK | 23.09.2004 | GR | 23.09.2004 | PT | 23.11.2004 | AT | 01.02.2005 | CY | 01.02.2005 | LU | 01.02.2005 | BE | 28.02.2005 | CH | 28.02.2005 | LI | 28.02.2005 | MC | 28.02.2005 | [2008/03] |
Former [2007/20] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
AT | 01.02.2005 | ||
CY | 01.02.2005 | ||
LU | 01.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2007/08] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
AT | 01.02.2005 | ||
LU | 01.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/34] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
AT | 01.02.2005 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/14] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
CH | 28.02.2005 | ||
LI | 28.02.2005 | ||
MC | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2006/13] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
NL | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
BE | 28.02.2005 | ||
Former [2005/24] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
IE | 23.06.2004 | ||
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/22] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
DK | 23.09.2004 | ||
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/06] | FI | 23.06.2004 | |
GR | 23.09.2004 | ||
Former [2005/02] | FI | 23.06.2004 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]DE3921422 (BOSCH SIEMENS HAUSGERAETE [DE]) [AD] 1* the whole document *; | [Y]EP0677800 (MERLONI ELETTRODOMESTICI SPA [IT]) [Y] 1 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5762080 (EDWARDS JAMES M [US], et al) [Y] 1 * the whole document * |