|
07.08.2013 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2012 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.09.2012 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2012 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
11.07.2012 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
11.07.2012 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.03.2012 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.03.2012 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
17 |
|
08.03.2012 |
Processing of grant of a patent after appeal (internal) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2012 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2012 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.05.2011 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.05.2011 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.05.2011 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2011 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
19 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Annexes in respect of a client data request |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2011 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Appeal |
2 |
|
02.02.2011 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
8 |
|
28.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
27.12.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
19 |
|
25.09.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
20.09.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
5 |
|
20.09.2010 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.09.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.06.2010 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.02.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.02.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.01.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.01.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.12.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
21 |
|
12.10.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
17.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
32 |
|
13.08.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
16 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.04.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2007 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.03.2007 |
Consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.02.2007 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
24.01.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.12.2006 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Citation for the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
23 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
27.11.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.11.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.07.2006 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.06.2006 |
Letter filed before dispatch of the 1st communication from the Examining Division(examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.06.2005 |
Letter filed during examination procedure after communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2005 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Description |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
24.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
04.11.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.10.2003 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.10.2003 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.05.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.10.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.07.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.03.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
03.02.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |