|
29.09.2010 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.09.2010 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.09.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.09.2010 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.09.2010 |
Communication of the Enlarged Board of Appeal during review procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
26.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.05.2010 |
Communication of the Registry during review procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.05.2010 |
Order from the Enlarged Board of Appeal in review procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
12 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
119 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
32 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Annexes (other than cited documents) regarding review procedure |
Appeal |
30 |
|
16.04.2010 |
Letter relating to review procedure |
Appeal |
15 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
11.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.02.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.02.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.02.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
16 |
|
08.02.2010 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
4 |
|
27.01.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.01.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
19.01.2010 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
29.12.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
14 |
|
26.11.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
4 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
18.11.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
17 |
|
29.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.06.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.06.2009 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.06.2009 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.06.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
06.05.2009 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
2 |
|
30.04.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.04.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.08.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2008 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
5 |
|
25.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2008 |
F3060 Request to provide missing authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.07.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2008 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2008 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.07.2008 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
34 |
|
13.05.2008 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.05.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
02.05.2008 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
14.04.2008 |
Request for change of representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
10 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.02.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
7 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.01.2008 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
03.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
02.01.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.12.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2007 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
20.12.2007 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
08.12.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
26.11.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.11.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2007 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.09.2007 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
31.01.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2005 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.08.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.07.2005 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
57 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
29 |
|
29.06.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
27 |
|
28.06.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
58 |
|
19.08.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.04.2004 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.03.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.11.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
59 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2003 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2003 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.04.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2003 |
Refusal of request for extension of time limit |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.03.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2002 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.03.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
22.02.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.02.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.10.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Annex |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.08.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.04.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.03.2001 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.03.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2001 |
Request for accelerated examination |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.10.2000 |
Maintenance of the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.08.2000 |
Invitation to confirm maintenance of the application and to correct deficiencies in the Written Opinion/amend application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.03.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.03.2000 |
Letter concerning the inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.03.2000 |
Deficiency in designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.02.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
74 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
42 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Letter concerning search matters |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
07.02.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |