|
09.06.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2009 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.07.2008 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Approval of request for amendments/corrections |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.06.2008 |
New pages for Druckexemplar |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.05.2008 |
English translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2008 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
14.05.2008 |
Request for correction/amendment of the text proposed for grant sent until 31.03.2012 |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
07.05.2008 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Letter relating to the automatic debiting procedure |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.03.2008 |
Submission concerning a transfer of rights (applicant) |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Communication about the grant of a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.01.2008 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
28.11.2007 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
24.10.2006 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
11 |
|
27.09.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
27.09.2006 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
16.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
14.08.2006 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
20.06.2006 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.06.2006 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Change of composition of the board (except boards 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.10.2004 |
Communication to appellant regarding the appeal number (ex parte) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.10.2004 |
Composition of the board (except 325, 337 and 341) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.09.2004 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
10 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Patent Document cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
20 |
|
08.09.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.09.2004 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
07.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
05.07.2004 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.05.2004 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
06.05.2004 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.01.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.10.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.08.2003 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Consultation by telephone/in person (with time limit) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
06.06.2003 |
Result of consultation by telephone/in person |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.06.2003 |
Decision to allow further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.05.2003 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.05.2003 |
Request for further processing |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.03.2003 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn (no reply to communication from the Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.01.2003 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.11.2002 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.11.2002 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.10.2002 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Communication concerning non paid of designation fees |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.07.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2002 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.06.2002 |
Request for transfer of rights |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.12.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
01.03.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |