EP1079163 - Flexible expansion joint for tubes and assembling method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.09.2007 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Waterworks Technology Development Organization Co., Ltd. 1-3-2700, Umeda 1-chome Osaka 530-0001 / JP | [2006/47] |
Former [2001/09] | For all designated states Waterworks Technology Development Organization Co., Ltd. 1-3-2700, Umeda 1-chome Osaka 530-0001 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakai, Kosuke 4217-1-103, Karato, Arino-cho, Kita-ku Kobe-shi, Hyogo-ken 651-1514 / JP | [2001/09] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/09] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, Dr., et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Postfach 86 06 24 81633 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00105053.3 | 09.03.2000 | [2001/09] | Priority number, date | US19990383344 | 26.08.1999 Original published format: US 383344 | [2001/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1079163 | Date: | 28.02.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1079163 | Date: | 18.12.2002 | [2002/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1079163 | Date: | 22.11.2006 | Language: | EN | [2006/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.10.2002 | Classification | IPC: | F16L27/04, F16L27/10 | [2001/09] | CPC: |
F16L27/026 (EP,US);
F16L27/04 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [2003/37] |
Former [2001/09] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Flexible Dehnverbindung für Rohrleitungen und Verfahren zu ihrem Zusammenbau | [2001/09] | English: | Flexible expansion joint for tubes and assembling method thereof | [2001/09] | French: | Joint de dilatation flexible pour tuyauterie et sa méthode d'assemblage | [2001/09] | Examination procedure | 11.03.2003 | Examination requested [2003/19] | 15.05.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.06.2003 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 23.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.11.2003 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, CH, CY, DK, ES, FI, GR, IE, LU, MC, PT, SE | 13.02.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.2004 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.01.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.05.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 22.08.2005 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.12.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.04.2006 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.08.2006 | Fee for grant paid | 17.08.2006 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.08.2007 | No opposition filed within time limit [2007/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.03.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.03.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.03.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.03.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 13.08.2003 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 13.08.2003 | SE   M01   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US366043 (WALTON GEORGE W.) [A] 1* column 2, line 30 - line 38; figure 1 *; | [Y]US4126337 (NAGAO SHOZO, et al) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * figures 1,2; claims 1-5 *; | [A]GB2066399 (SUIKEN KK) [A] 1 * page 3, line 66 - page 4, line 14; figures 1-5; claims 1-5 *; | [Y]EP0797040 (YANO GIKEN KK [JP]) [Y] 1,3,5,6 * figure 4; claims 1-10 *; | [A]US5740839 (KUO HSIEN-JEN [TW], et al) [A] 1,4,5,7 * column 2, line 28 - line 39 * |