EP1048366 - A method for disposing a waste [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 18.08.2006 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.08.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 20.09.2006 [2006/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states JFE Engineering Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2005/41] | For all designated states JFE Engineering Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2004/05] | For all designated states JFE Engineering Corporation 1-2, Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | ||
Former [2000/44] | For all designated states NKK CORPORATION 1-2 Marunouchi 1-chome, Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Shimizu, Tohru, c/o NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept. 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210-0855 / JP | 02 /
Hirayama, Atsushi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 03 /
Hamaguchi, Keizo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 04 /
Nakahara, Keisuke NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 05 /
Shinagawa, Takuya NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 06 /
Fujisawa, Yoshinari NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 07 /
Osada, Yo, c/o NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept. 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210-0855 / JP | 08 /
Yokoyama, Takashi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 09 /
Suzuki, Yasuo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 10 /
Akiyama, Hajime NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | 11 /
Ayukawa, Susumu NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | [2005/21] |
Former [2000/49] | 01 /
Shimizu, Tohru, c/o NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept. 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210-0855 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirayama, Atsushi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
03 /
Hamaguchi, Keizo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakahara, Keisuke NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
05 /
Shinagawa, Takuya NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
06 /
Fujisawa, Yoshinari NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
07 /
Osada, Yo, c/o NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept. 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho, Kawasaki-ku Kawasaki 210-0855 / JP | |||
08 /
Yokoyama, Takashi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
09 /
Suzuki, Yasuo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
10 /
Akiyawa, Hajime NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
11 /
Ayukawa, Susumu NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
Former [2000/44] | 01 /
Shimizu, Tohru NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | ||
02 /
Hirayama, Atsushi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
03 /
Hamaguchi, Keizo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
04 /
Nakahara, Keisuke NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
05 /
Shinagawa, Takuya NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
06 /
Fujisawa, Yoshinari NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
07 /
Osada, Yo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
08 /
Yokoyama, Takashi NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
09 /
Suzuki, Yasuo NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
10 /
Akiyawa, Hajime NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | |||
11 /
Ayukawa, Susumu NKK Corp., Int.Prop.Dept., 1-1, Minamiwatarida-cho Kawasaki-ku, Kawasaki 210 / JP | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastrasse 30 81925 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2000/44] | HOFFMANN - EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00107982.1 | 18.04.2000 | [2000/44] | Priority number, date | JP19990119736 | 27.04.1999 Original published format: JP 11973699 | JP20000006571 | 14.01.2000 Original published format: JP 2000006571 | [2000/44] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1048366 | Date: | 02.11.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/44] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1048366 | Date: | 29.01.2003 | [2003/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1048366 | Date: | 12.10.2005 | Language: | EN | [2005/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2002 | Classification | IPC: | B09B3/00, B09C1/06, F23G5/00 | [2000/44] | CPC: |
F23G7/06 (EP);
B09B1/00 (KR);
B09B3/00 (EP);
B09B3/45 (EP);
B09C1/06 (EP);
F23G5/02 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | FR, GB [2003/42] |
Former [2000/44] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Entsorgung von Abfällen | [2000/44] | English: | A method for disposing a waste | [2000/44] | French: | Procédé d' élimination de déchets | [2000/44] | Examination procedure | 18.04.2000 | Examination requested [2000/44] | 03.11.2004 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2005 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 18.04.2005 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.08.2005 | Fee for grant paid | 11.08.2005 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2006 | No opposition filed within time limit [2006/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.04.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.04.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.04.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.04.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4977839 (FOCHTMAN EDWARD G [US], et al) [X] 1-6,8-12,16 * column 15, line 5 - column 17, line 32 * * column 20, line 31 - column 21, line 8 * * figures 3,6,7 *; | [X]WO9737784 (FOSTER WHEELER ENVIRONMENTAL C [US], et al) [X] 1,4,8,9,12-14,17 * page 13, line 16 - page 20, line 28 * * figures 1,2 *; | [XA]WO9004470 (ORENSTEIN & KOPPEL AG [DE]) [X] 1-4 * page 9, line 1 - line 36 * * page 13, line 20 - line 30 * * figures 1,5 * [A] 20-22; | [A]JPH07155722 ; | [A]US5688335 (KRABBENHOFT HERMAN OTTO [US], et al) | [X] - TROXLER W L ET AL, "TREATMENT OF NONHAZARDOUS PETROLEUM-CONTAMINATED SOILS BY THERMAL DESORPTION TECHNOLOGIES", JOURNAL OF THE AIR AND WASTE MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION, AIR AND WASTE MANAGEMENT ASSOCIATION, PITTSBURGH, US, (19931101), vol. 43, no. 11, ISSN 1047-3289, pages 1512 - 1525, XP000403301 [X] 1-4,8,9,11,12 * page 1512, column L, line 1 - page 1514, column R, line 23 * * figures 1,2 * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19951031), vol. 1995, no. 09, & JP07155722 A 19950620 (NKK CORP) [A] 1,7,18,19 * abstract * |