|
06.10.2009 |
Closing of application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.09.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
21.09.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
18.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
12 |
|
18.09.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
04.09.2009 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.07.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
02.04.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.03.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
F3014 Oral Proceedings: Order cancelling/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2009 |
F3017 Oral Proceedings: Notification of cancellation/postponing |
Appeal |
1 |
|
16.03.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
2 |
|
13.03.2009 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.02.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
6 |
|
16.02.2009 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.01.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.09.2007 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.07.2007 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
10.07.2007 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.06.2007 |
Notice drawing attention to the payment of the renewal fee and additional fee |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Description |
Appeal |
7 |
|
14.05.2007 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.03.2007 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.01.2007 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.01.2007 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.11.2006 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.11.2006 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.06.2006 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.06.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2006 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
14.06.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2005 |
Adjournment of examination/opposition proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.01.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
19.11.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (examination procedure) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.11.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
31.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
30.03.2004 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
14 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.11.2003 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2001 |
Response to enquiry for communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.07.2001 |
General enquiry |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.11.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.09.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
15.06.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.06.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
27.04.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
6 |