|
28.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
F3004 Communication of the Registry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.03.2013 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
01.03.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2013 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.02.2013 |
Data sheet for the decision |
Appeal |
21 |
|
26.02.2013 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
26.09.2012 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
9 |
|
18.09.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.09.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Non-Patent Literature cited during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
9 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.08.2012 |
Non-scannable object |
Appeal |
3 |
|
17.08.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
14.08.2012 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
11 |
|
20.07.2012 |
F3305 Communication of the Board of Appeal (ex parte/ inter partes) |
Appeal |
3 |
|
13.07.2012 |
General enquiry |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.06.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.06.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
15.05.2012 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.05.2012 |
Letter Boards of Appeal, with label space |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Authorisation |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.05.2012 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.03.2012 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.03.2012 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2012 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.03.2012 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2012 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.03.2011 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the opponent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.06.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
8 |
|
13.03.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.02.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
5 |
|
12.02.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
6 |
|
26.01.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
15.01.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.01.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
04.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
3 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Decision rejecting the opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Means of redress |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
25.11.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.11.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.11.2008 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.10.2008 |
Information about the result of oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
08.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
10 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
05.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Any annexes (other than citation) to an opposition letter |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
04.09.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.05.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.05.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.05.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.04.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.04.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Information concerning oral proceedings |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.04.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.04.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
13.05.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
26.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
23.03.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
4 |
|
09.09.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.08.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
19.07.2004 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.03.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.02.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.02.2004 |
Request for documents |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.01.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
2 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
16.12.2003 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.12.2003 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
13.02.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.12.2002 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Brief communication to applicant/representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.08.2002 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.08.2002 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
51 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
16.05.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
24 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
11.01.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
75 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
45 |
|
19.09.2001 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
47 |
|
12.09.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.09.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.07.2001 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.04.2001 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.10.2000 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.09.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.07.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
57 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
16.05.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent (divisional application) |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
29 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
09.10.1997 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
44 |