|
05.02.2016 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2012 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative for the applicant |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
05.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.11.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2008 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
14 |
|
24.10.2008 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.09.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
7 |
|
18.06.2008 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.02.2008 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
13.02.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Appeal |
5 |
|
11.07.2007 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.07.2007 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
06.07.2007 |
Fax relating to Appeal procedure |
Appeal |
4 |
|
03.05.2007 |
F3040 Term extension: Yes/No |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2007 |
Annexes filed during the procedure of transfer of rights |
Appeal |
2 |
|
28.04.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.04.2007 |
Request concerning the applicant/representative |
Appeal |
3 |
|
29.12.2006 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Claims |
Appeal |
1 |
|
20.12.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
13 |
|
19.12.2006 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
19 |
|
16.11.2006 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.10.2006 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
18.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
17.10.2006 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.09.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.08.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Annex to a communication |
Opposition |
4 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Decision revoking the European patent |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
11 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.08.2006 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.03.2006 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
5 |
|
20.03.2006 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
15.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.02.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
4 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.02.2006 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.01.2006 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
29.12.2004 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.12.2004 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
6 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.08.2004 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.07.2004 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
09.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Notice of opposition |
Opposition |
15 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
08.07.2004 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
9 |
|
28.08.2003 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.06.2003 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
31.03.2003 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
06.03.2003 |
Documents for grant of a patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.11.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.12.2000 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
25.10.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.09.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Matter concerning the application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.07.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
11 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
19 |
|
25.05.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |