|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
13.01.2015 |
CDS Clean up - amended data concerning the representative of the applicant (Association) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (opponent) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.12.2010 |
Communication to the parties concerning the termination of the opposition proceedings (proprietor) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.12.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with revocation of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
04.08.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.07.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
33 |
|
05.07.2010 |
F3013 Oral Proceedings: Forwarding minutes |
Appeal |
2 |
|
29.06.2010 |
F3316 Oral Proceedings: Minutes (Appellant: Opponent) |
Appeal |
20 |
|
07.06.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.05.2010 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
28.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
6 |
|
25.05.2010 |
Letter dealing with oral proceedings during the appeal procedure |
Appeal |
3 |
|
22.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
09.03.2010 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
05.03.2010 |
F3011.1 Oral Proceedings: summons |
Appeal |
4 |
|
05.03.2010 |
F3350 Communication regarding oral proceedings (art. 15 Rules of Procedure of the Boards of Appeal) |
Appeal |
6 |
|
02.03.2010 |
F3010 Oral proceedings: order for summons |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Claims |
Appeal |
3 |
|
06.07.2009 |
Reply to appeal |
Appeal |
18 |
|
23.04.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.04.2009 |
F3344 Setting time limit for reply/ file observations to appeal (inter partes) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
38 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
14 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
36 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
24 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
54 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
16 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
78 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
22 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
52 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
66 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Cited document during appeal procedure |
Appeal |
34 |
|
27.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
23.03.2009 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
23 |
|
12.03.2009 |
Letter relating to Appeal Procedure |
Appeal |
1 |
|
04.03.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
19.02.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
4 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Annex to the communication |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
04.02.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
30.12.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.12.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2008 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Annex |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
9 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.12.2008 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
31.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
23.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
40 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
22.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
8 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
6 |
|
20.10.2008 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Fax dealing with oral proceedings during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
4 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
39 |
|
13.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.06.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
14.06.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
48 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
13.06.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.06.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
5 |
|
02.06.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
25.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Matter concerning the application |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
15 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
16 |
|
16.11.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
07.11.2007 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
18 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Communication confirming withdrawal from representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
26.07.2007 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.07.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
1 |
|
11.07.2007 |
Request for change of representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.06.2007 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
36 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
78 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
24 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
38 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
66 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
34 |
|
18.06.2007 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
22 |
|
12.06.2007 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
08.06.2007 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.05.2007 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
20.07.2006 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.05.2006 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
09.05.2006 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
25 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
09.05.2006 |
Translation of priority document |
Search / examination |
28 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
10.01.2006 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
39 |
|
04.01.2006 |
Invitation to file a translation of the previous application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.12.2005 |
Intention to grant (signatures) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Patent document cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
02.02.2005 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.09.2004 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Description |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
02.12.2002 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.08.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
17.12.2001 |
Letter concerning the designation and/or extension and/or validation of states |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
02.08.2001 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.08.2001 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.11.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
16.08.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
07.08.2000 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
36 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.06.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |