EP1065014 - "C" Block roll bending [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.03.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.03.2003 | Refusal of application | published on 23.04.2003 [2003/17] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Danieli Corporation, A Delaware Corporation 800 Cranberry Woods Drive- Suite 400 Cranberry Township, PA 16066 / US | [2001/01] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dittmar, Robert W. 1560 Montgomery Road Allison Park, PA 15101 / US | [2001/01] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2001/01] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Maximilianstrasse 58 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00113263.8 | 21.06.2000 | [2001/01] | Priority number, date | US19990339526 | 24.06.1999 Original published format: US 339526 | [2001/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1065014 | Date: | 03.01.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/01] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.10.2000 | Classification | IPC: | B21B29/00 | [2001/01] | CPC: |
B21B29/00 (EP,US);
B21B2269/04 (EP,US);
B21B31/203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, DE, FR, GB, IT [2001/38] |
Former [2001/01] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Biegung für einen "C"-förmigen Walzblock | [2001/01] | English: | "C" Block roll bending | [2001/01] | French: | Cambrage pour un bloc en "C" de laminoir | [2001/01] | Examination procedure | 21.06.2000 | Examination requested [2001/01] | 05.06.2002 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 22.11.2002 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [2003/17] | 02.12.2002 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2003/17] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [PX]EP1005923 (KVAERNER METALS CLECIM [FR]) [PX] 1-6,10-12 * column 13, line 17 - column 15, line 29; figure -; claim 1 * * column 10, line 25 - line 36 *; | [DA]JP01005612 ; | [A]JPS58168407 ; | [DA]US5638716 (JONEN PETER [DE]) [DA] 1-7,12 * column 2, line 38 - column 3, line 36; figure - *; | [A]US4238947 (GRAHAM HOWARD A [US], et al) [A] 1 * figure - * | [DA] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19890421), vol. 013, no. 170, Database accession no. (M - 817), & JP01005612 A 19890110 (HITACHI LTD) [DA] 1-6,10-12 * abstract * | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, (19840111), vol. 008, no. 005, Database accession no. (M - 267), & JP58168407 A 19831004 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO KK) [A] 1-4 * abstract * |