|
11.11.2014 |
CDS Clean up - amended applicant details |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2010 |
Decision to maintain the European patent in amended form |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.07.2010 |
Termination of the opposition proceedings with maintenance of patent |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.07.2010 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Filing of the translation of the amended claims |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.07.2010 |
French translation of claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2010 |
German translation of the claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
15.07.2010 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication of bibliographic data |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication to opponent concerning maintenance |
Opposition |
3 |
|
06.04.2010 |
Communication with request to pay printing fees and file translations |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.03.2010 |
Maintenance of the patent with the documents specified in the final decision |
Opposition |
1 |
|
12.01.2010 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
15.12.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
27.11.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.11.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
2 |
|
09.11.2009 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
6 |
|
08.10.2009 |
F3042 Dispatch of attendance note about a phone conversation |
Appeal |
3 |
|
05.10.2009 |
F3039 Attendance note about a phone conversation and continuation sheet |
Appeal |
1 |
|
14.07.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
11.07.2009 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
F3028 Inadmissibility of the appeal: non-submission of the statement of grounds |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2009 |
F3345 Forwarding of submissions to parties |
Appeal |
2 |
|
24.06.2009 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.04.2009 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
3 |
|
31.03.2009 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
1 |
|
31.03.2009 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.03.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2009 |
Communication about missing advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
28.01.2009 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.01.2009 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Decision of the Opposition Division and instruction |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Druckexemplar in opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) - opposition |
Opposition |
8 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Interlocutory decision in opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Internal form - Opposition/addressees |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - conclusion of the proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (Opposition Division) - introduction of the parties |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
23.01.2009 |
Scanned annex to a communication - opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
17.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
2 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Claims |
Opposition |
3 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
09.10.2008 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
06.10.2008 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
02.10.2008 |
Request for interpreters during oral proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
03.03.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
23.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.02.2008 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Annex to the communication - opposition |
Opposition |
2 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
15.02.2008 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Opposition |
4 |
|
07.02.2008 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Opposition |
2 |
|
18.01.2008 |
Communication of amended entries concerning the representative |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.01.2008 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's representative |
Search / examination |
7 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Communication concerning the filing of a power of attorney |
Opposition |
4 |
|
14.11.2007 |
Communication of amended entries |
Opposition |
2 |
|
02.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
01.11.2007 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
6 |
|
30.10.2007 |
Submission concerning representation |
Opposition |
3 |
|
18.04.2006 |
Advice of delivery |
Opposition |
1 |
|
10.04.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
15.03.2006 |
Letter which had not been notified |
Opposition |
3 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
02.03.2006 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.02.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
24.02.2006 |
Reply of the patent proprietor to the notice(s) of opposition |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
27.12.2005 |
Grant of extension of time limit (opposition procedure) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
19.12.2005 |
Request for extension of time limit |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition and request to file observations |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.08.2005 |
Notice of further oppositions to opponent(s) |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Brief communication - Opposition proceedings |
Opposition |
1 |
|
29.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
21.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
3 |
|
20.07.2005 |
Communication of a notice of opposition - first information to patent proprietor |
Opposition |
1 |
|
18.07.2005 |
Letter regarding the opposition procedure (no time limit) |
Opposition |
2 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
3 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Non-patent literature cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
23 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
18 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
11 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
10 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
14 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
19 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
5 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
12 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
7 |
|
12.07.2005 |
Patent document cited during the opposition procedure |
Opposition |
20 |
|
11.07.2005 |
Filing of a new opposition |
Opposition |
16 |
|
02.09.2004 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
30.06.2004 |
Translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
26.04.2004 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
22 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Description |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.01.2003 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.10.2002 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2002 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
10.12.2001 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.07.2001 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.01.2001 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
06.12.2000 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Annex to European Search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
23.10.2000 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2000 |
Communication to designated inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
34 |
|
18.09.2000 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
20 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Description |
Search / examination |
13 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
05.07.2000 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
7 |