EP1199445 - Apparatus and method of fuel preheating in combined gas and steam turbine plants [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.07.2003 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.07.2003 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.08.2003 [2003/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2002/17] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schmid, Erich Am Ziegelacker 18 91080 Marloffstein / DE | 02 /
Schoettler, Michael, Dr. Theodor-Klippel-Strasse 6 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2002/17] | Application number, filing date | 00122602.6 | 17.10.2000 | [2002/17] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1199445 | Date: | 24.04.2002 | Language: | DE | [2002/17] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.04.2001 | Classification | IPC: | F01K23/10, F02C7/224 | [2002/17] | CPC: |
F02C7/224 (EP,US);
F01K23/106 (EP,US);
F05D2220/72 (EP,US);
F05D2220/74 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | [2003/03] |
Former [2002/17] | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Brennstoffvorwärmung in kombinierten Gas- und Dampfturbinenanlagen | [2002/17] | English: | Apparatus and method of fuel preheating in combined gas and steam turbine plants | [2002/17] | French: | Appareil et méthode pour préchauffer le carburant dans des centrales combinées avec turbines à gaz et à vapeur | [2002/17] | Examination procedure | 25.10.2002 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2003/34] | 21.02.2003 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [2003/34] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85a EPC 1973 | 02.12.2002 | AT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | BE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | CH   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | CY   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | DE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | DK   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | ES   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | FI   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | FR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | GB   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | GR   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | IE   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | IT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | LU   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | MC   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | NL   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | PT   M01   Not yet paid | 02.12.2002 | SE   M01   Not yet paid | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 02.12.2002 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2002 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0931911 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [X] 1,3,12 * column 7, paragraph L - column 10, paragraph 1; figure - *; | [A]DE4321081 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 52 - column 6, line 40; figure - *; | [A]EP0588392 (KEMA NV [NL]) [A] 1 * column 4, line 32 - line 40; figure 1 * |