EP1093185 - Phased array spread spectrum system and method [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 04.01.2008 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 25.11.2009 [2009/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza, Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2006/31] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION 3411 Silverside Road Concord Plaza Suite 105 Hagley Building Wilmington, DE 19810 / US | ||
Former [2001/16] | For all designated states INTERDIGITAL TECHNOLOGY CORPORATION Suite 527, 300 Delaware Avenue Wilmington, DE 19801 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schilling, Donald L. Hoffstot Lane Sands Point, NY 11050 / US | [2001/16] | Representative(s) | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner Bolte Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstraße 47 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner GbR Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2007/29] | Bohnenberger, Johannes, et al Meissner, Bolte & Partner Widenmayerstrasse 48 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2001/16] | Frohwitter, Bernhard, Dipl.-Ing. Patent- und Rechtsanwälte, Possartstrasse 20 81679 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 00123438.4 | 16.06.1995 | [2001/16] | Priority number, date | US19940266769 | 28.06.1994 Original published format: US 266769 | [2001/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1093185 | Date: | 18.04.2001 | Language: | EN | [2001/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1093185 | Date: | 21.11.2001 | [2001/47] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.2001 | Classification | IPC: | H01Q3/26, H04B7/08, G01S3/42 | [2001/47] | CPC: |
H04B7/0894 (EP,US);
G01S3/42 (EP,US);
H01Q3/22 (EP,US);
H01Q3/26 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2605 (EP,US);
H01Q3/2682 (EP,US);
H04B1/69 (EP,US);
H04B1/707 (EP,US);
H04B7/084 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2001/16] | H01Q3/26, H04B7/08 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, DK, ES, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE [2001/16] | Title | German: | Spreizspektrumsystem mit phasengesteuerten Antennenprinzipien | [2001/16] | English: | Phased array spread spectrum system and method | [2001/16] | French: | Système à spectre étalé utilisant les principes des antennes réseau | [2001/16] | Examination procedure | 03.11.2000 | Examination requested [2001/16] | 14.03.2003 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.09.2003 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.02.2007 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.08.2007 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2008/06] | 19.09.2007 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2008/06] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP95926635.4 / EP0767976 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 03.11.2000 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.04.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 13.06.2001 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.06.2002 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.06.2003 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 14.06.2004 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 14.06.2005 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 14.06.2006 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 14.06.2007 | Renewal fee patent year 13 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 03.11.2000 | 06   M06   Fee paid on   26.04.2001 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4189733 (MALM ROBERT [US]) [A] 1-5 * column 1, line 7 - line 17 * * column 2, line 58 - column 3, line 28 * * column 4, line 40 - line 58 * * column 5, line 14 - column 6, line 54 *; | [Y]US5119103 (EVANS ALAN G [US], et al) [Y] 1-5 * column A * * column 3, line 63 - column 4, line 36 *; | [A]GB2259430 (MOTOROLA LTD [GB]) [A] 1-5* the whole document *; | [Y] - SIVANAND S, "ON ADAPTIVE ARRAYS IN MOBILE COMMUNICATION", COMMERCIAL APPLICATIONS AND DUAL USE TECHNOLOGY. ATLANTA, JUNE 16 - 17, 1993, PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL TELESYSTEMS CONFERENCE, NEW YORK, IEEE, US, (19930616), pages 55 - 58, XP000416073 [Y] 1-5 * page 58, column L - page 59, column L * * figure 1 * |